Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mayton, John B., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time233 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Dec 5 2008 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912320-Proof of Service (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE (PETITION) [912320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS DCSS (Paternity) - Complaint - Dispo Date: 12/05/2008- Disposition Type:Judgment/Order; MannerBefore Hearing |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 912410-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service COMPLAINT [912410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.