Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd. C O Ocean Network Express, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Philadelphia Truck Line, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Receipt #000515792 for $297.25 paid for by Daniel Wechsler
Date: January 31, 2023Entry of Appearance Daniel A. Wechsler
Date: January 31, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 31, 2023Complaint
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000545384 for $10.00 paid for by Daniel Wechsler Receipt |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Reinstate | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000541507 for $10.00 paid for by Daniel Wechsler Receipt |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000518852 for $10.00 paid for by Daniel Wechsler Receipt |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Reinstate | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return-Not served 2/8/2023. Paid 55.65 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000515792 for $297.25 paid for by Daniel Wechsler Receipt |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Daniel A. Wechsler Entry of Appearance |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.