Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Regis, Marylande, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure: Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Receipt #000515774 for $297.25 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN
Date: January 31, 2023Complaint
Date: January 31, 2023Praecipe to Reinstate
Date: March 06, 2023Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return/ Not Served
Date: July 28, 2023Receipt #000533964 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN
Date: May 16, 2023Receipt #000521904 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN
Date: March 09, 2023Receipt #000521311 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN
Date: March 07, 2023Entry of Appearance for Defendant; Shaina P. Bethala on behalf of Marylande Regis.
Date: April 26, 2023Praecipe to Discontinue Case without Prejudice
Date: May 16, 2023Receipt #000530966 for $50.00 paid for by Shaina P Bethala
Date: April 27, 2023Answer and New Matter - Defendant's Answer and New Matter
Date: April 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return/ Not Served Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000533964 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN Receipt |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue Case without Prejudice | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000530966 for $50.00 paid for by Shaina P Bethala Receipt |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance for Defendant; Shaina P. Bethala on behalf of Marylande Regis. Entry of Appearance for Defendant |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer and New Matter - Defendant's Answer and New Matter Answer and New Matter |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000521904 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN Receipt |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000521311 for $10.00 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN Receipt |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Reinstate | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000515774 for $297.25 paid for by GERALDINE M LINN Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.