Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jacobs, Naiderah, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Credit Card |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: January 30, 2023Receipt #000515708 for $297.25 paid for by Kirsten Armstrong
Date: January 31, 2023Praecipe to Reinstate
Date: April 14, 2023Receipt #000529112 for $10.00 paid for by Kirsten Armstrong
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted for 2/2/24 @9:30am Application for Continuance Granted |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000529112 for $10.00 paid for by Kirsten Armstrong Receipt |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Reinstate | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000515708 for $297.25 paid for by Kirsten Armstrong Receipt |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.