Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stormwater Authority Of The City Of Chester, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case against Davis, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Nr - Municipal Lien - Municipal Lien: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeLiens |
Municipal Lien
Date: July 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000531536 for $10.00 paid for by Kyle H Miller Receipt |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe With Fee | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000522952 for $10.00 paid for by Kyle H Miller Receipt |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Issued and Writ Exit | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Scire Facias | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Scire Facias | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000498359 for $17.50 paid for by Jason J Leininger Receipt |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered for on 07-28-2022 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 07-28-2022 Lien |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000483447 for $23.50 paid for by David D Dugan Receipt |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Municipal Lien |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.