Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jacobi, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Credit Card |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: July 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000527005 for $10.00 paid for by Dennis E Shean Receipt |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue Case without Prejudice | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance; Dennis E. Shean on behalf of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Entry of Appearance |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return-NO SRV. ON Dfndt. 08/18/2022 @3:28p.m. $54.10 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000483303 for $297.25 paid for by Robert W Cusick Receipt |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.