Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, As Owner Trustee Of The Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Vi-A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Welch, Charles, Welch, Nicole A, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure: Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000556203 for $25.00 paid for by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as owner trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VI-A Receipt |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Deed Poll Acknowledged and Returned | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return. deft served 8/1/23 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return. deft served 8/1/23 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Postponement of Sheriff's Sale; 236 Notice of Order Sent on 07/17/2023; (J. ECKEL) Order Granting Postponement of Sheriff's Sale |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Sheriff's Sale Motion |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Sheriff's Sale Motion |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Alternate Service 236 Notice of Order Sent 05/11/2023; J. Whelan Order for Alternate Service |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of the Date of Continued Sheriff's Sale | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of the Date of Continued Sheriff's Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.