Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Delco Nine Lp-Edgewater Apartments, filed a(n) Civil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other case against Fox, Michelle, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts with John J. Whelan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
|
Emergency Petition to Stay Eviction
Date: June 07, 2022Praecipe to Strike
Date: July 12, 2022Certificate of Service
Date: July 11, 2022Receipt #000480224 for $10.00 paid for by Matthew R. Bradley
Date: July 12, 2022Petition for Leave to Appeal Nunc Pro Tunc
Date: June 07, 2022Receipt #000473863 for $49.50 paid for by Michelle Fox
Date: June 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Strike | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000480224 for $10.00 paid for by Matthew R. Bradley Receipt |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Appeal Nunc Pro Tunc J. Whelan 236 Notice of Order Sent on 6/15/22; Judge Whelan on 6/14/22 Order Granting Appeal Nunc Pro Tunc |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order For Emergency Petition To Stay Eviction - GRANTED 236 Notice of Order Sent on 6/10/2022 Judge Whelan Order |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Emergency Petition to Stay Eviction Emergency Petition |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Leave to Appeal Nunc Pro Tunc Petition |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000473863 for $49.50 paid for by Michelle Fox Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.