Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Green, Cherae, Summers, Hikeem, filed a(n) Civil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other case against Beitzel, Alisha M, Ford, Hunter, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
|
Complaint
Date: June 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order; 236 Notice of Order Sent on 09/22/2023; (J. WHELAN) Scheduling Order |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel Judge Dozor 236 Notice of Order Sent on 3/7/23 Order Granting Motion to Compel |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Jake D. Becker on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Entry of Appearance |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000493100 for $26.00 paid for by Leonard S Sabato Receipt |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Cover Sheet | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS, HUNTER FORD AND ALISHA M. BEITZEL'S, MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS', CHERAE GREEN AND HIKEEM T. SUMMERS, RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Petition to Compel |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Substitute Verification | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return-ALISHA M. BEITZEL-SERVED ON 06/29/22-$80.70 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and New Matter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.