Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Leto, Francis J., Leto, Monica Von Lima, Stillwater Insurance Co., filed a(n) Civil - Tort - Tort: Other case against Conley & Son, Inc. D B A J. Conley & Sons, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Tort - Tort: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
|
Complaint
Date: June 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Brief | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Preliminary Objections | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000492749 for $50.00 paid for by Andrew Connolly Eckert Receipt |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Pursuant to Rule 1028.1 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT CONLEY & SON, INC. D/B/A J. CONLEY & SONS PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT Preliminary Objections |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY A JURY OF TWELVE MEMBERS Jury Trial Demanded |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service e/filed Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.