Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kidane v. Upper Darby License and Inspectors et al
A Civil - Civil Appeal - Civil Appeal: Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 28, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 27, 2023
Filing Location
Delaware County, PA
Category
Civil - Civil Appeal - Civil Appeal: Other
Status
Judgment on the Pleadings
Overview
Causes of Action
cause of action
cause of action arose
cause of action if thL
to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of Act 43
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Important Notice
Date: May 03, 2023Receipt 000514139 for 10.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Jan 20, 2023Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End with Prejudice
Date: Jan 19, 2023Application for Continuance Granted 3/3/23
Date: Jan 19, 2023Entry of Appearance Self Represented Party
Date: Dec 08, 2022Application for Continuance Granted new date 1/25/2023
Date: Oct 20, 2022Application for Continuance
Date: Oct 15, 2022Answer/Response to Motion/Petition
Date: Aug 25, 2022Answer/Response to Motion/Petition
Date: Aug 25, 2022Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena e/filed
Date: Aug 23, 2022Entry of Appearance Yodit Kidane
Date: Aug 17, 2022Motion for Consolidation
Date: Aug 12, 2022Receipt 000485580 for 26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Aug 09, 2022Application for Continuance Granted 11-3-2022
Date: Aug 09, 2022Receipt 000485289 for 26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Aug 08, 2022Receipt 000485270 for 26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Aug 08, 2022Application for Continuance(e-filed)
Date: Aug 05, 2022Application for Continuance Granted 8/25/22 objection from scott c. gottel
Date: Jun 21, 2022Correspondence Filed
Date: Jun 14, 2022Application for Continuance
Date: Jun 13, 2022Proof of Service
Date: Mar 19, 2022Proof of Service
Date: Mar 19, 2022Proof of Service
Date: Mar 19, 2022Proof of Service
Date: Mar 19, 2022Receipt 000459415 for 50.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Mar 18, 2022Answer to Preliminary Objections
Date: Mar 15, 2022Answer/Response to Motion/Petition
Date: Mar 15, 2022Preliminary Objections
Date: Mar 14, 2022Certificate of Service
Date: Mar 14, 2022Proof of Service E-FILED
Date: Nov 23, 2021Receipt 000439247 for 50.00 paid for by Scott C. Gottel
Date: Nov 15, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings e-filed
Date: Nov 15, 2021Proof of Service-efiled
Date: Nov 14, 2021Certificate of Service-efiled
Date: Nov 14, 2021Plaintiffs Reply to New Matters-efiled
Date: Nov 14, 2021Receipt 000438550 for 50.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane
Date: Nov 10, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: Nov 09, 2021Petition to Strike
Date: Nov 09, 2021Verification E-FILED
Date: Nov 09, 2021Preliminary Objections e-filed
Date: Nov 09, 2021Memorandum of Law-efiled
Date: Nov 09, 2021Verification E-FILED
Date: Nov 04, 2021Answer to Amended Complaint E filed
Date: Nov 04, 2021Receipt 000436400 for 50.00 paid for by Scott C. Gottel
Date: Oct 28, 2021Entry of Appearance for Defendant Scott C. Gottel e-filed
Date: Oct 27, 2021Notice to Defend
Date: Oct 15, 2021Proof of Service E filed
Date: Oct 14, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: Oct 13, 2021Notice to Defend
Date: Oct 12, 2021Entry of Appearance Self Represented Party
Date: Oct 12, 2021CDF with Complaint
Date: Oct 12, 2021Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal E-FILED
Date: Oct 07, 2021Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 06-27-2022
Date: Sep 28, 2021Appeal
Date: Sep 28, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Important Notice | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000514139 for $10.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End with Prejudice Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted 3/3/23 Application for Continuance Granted |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order-Plntff(s) Motion to STRIKE OBJECTIONS IS DENIED; 236 Notice of Order Sent 01/13/2023; (J. WHELAN) Order |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Self Represented Party | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted new date 1/25/2023 Application for Continuance Granted |
|
October 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response to Motion/Petition | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response to Motion/Petition | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena e/filed Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Yodit Kidane Entry of Appearance |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Consolidation | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000485580 for $26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted 11-3-2022 Application for Continuance Granted |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Objections or Insufficient Answers and for Answers Motion for Sanctions |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000485289 for $26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000485270 for $26.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance(e-filed) Application for Continuance |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Preliminary Objections Overruled J. Eckel 236 Notice of Order Sent on 7/22/2022 Order for Preliminary Objections Overruled |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion to Strike J. Eckel 236 Notice of Order Sent on 7/22/2022 Order Denying Motion to Strike |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted 8/25/22 objection from scott c. gottel Application for Continuance Granted |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
March 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000459415 for $50.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Preliminary Objections | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response to Motion/Petition | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Preliminary Objections | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Judgment on the Pleadings; 236 Notice of Order Sent 03/09/22; (J. ANGELOS) Order Denying Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Without Prejudice Plntff(s) Motion to Strike; 236 Notice of Order Sent 03/0/22; (J. ANGELOS) TWO ORDERS Order Denied |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service E-FILED Proof of Service |
|
November 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response to Motion/Petition e-filed Answer/Response to Motion/Petition |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000439247 for $50.00 paid for by Scott C. Gottel Receipt |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings e-filed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service-efiled Proof of Service |
|
November 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service-efiled Certificate of Service |
|
November 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Reply to New Matters-efiled Plaintiff's Reply to New Matters |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000438550 for $50.00 paid for by Miss Yodit Yonas Kidane Receipt |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition to Strike | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Verification E-FILED Verification |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT UPPER DARBY LICENSES AND INSPECTORS AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH NEW MATTER e-field Amended Answer |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Objections e-filed Preliminary Objections |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law-efiled Memorandum of Law |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Verification E-FILED Verification |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint E filed Answer to Amended Complaint |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000436400 for $50.00 paid for by Scott C. Gottel Receipt |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance for Defendant Scott C. Gottel e-filed Entry of Appearance for Defendant |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Defend | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service E filed Proof of Service |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Defend | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Self Represented Party | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CDF with Complaint Complaint |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal E-FILED Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000431746 for $297.25 paid for by Yodit Kidane Receipt |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 06-27-2022 Arbitration Date |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Appeal |