Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yost , Jennifer L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bonham , David C, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts with Margaret J. Amoroso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2013 |
CategoryFamily - Divorce - No Fault Only |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decree in Divorce (CARTISANO, J. 9-23-13) 236 N/S 9-25-13 Decree in Divorce |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
OJS 236 Notice of Decree DECREE |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Praecipe to Transmit the Record Praecipe to Transmit Divorce Record |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Counseling Notice Certificate |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Receipt# 027850 generated for the amount of $ 23.50 Receipt |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Under Section 3301 (D) Divorce Code Affidavit |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF CONSENT BY JENNIFER L.YOST,PLAINTIFF 12/18/12 Migrated Docket Entry |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF NOTICE OF INTENTION TO REQUEST ENTRY OF A DIVORCE DECREE UNDER 3301(C) OF THE DIVORCE CODE (JENNIFER L. YOST)- 12/18/12- PLAINTIFF Migrated Docket Entry |
|
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE Migrated Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.