Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Masi, Denise, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts with Margaret J. Amoroso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure: Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt #259539 for $25.00 paid for by FRIDFINNSDOTTIR , ESQ, JANA Receipt |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Deed Poll Acknowledged and Returned | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
PA.R.C.P. RULE 3129.2 {C} AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT/OWNER AND OTHER PARTIES OF INTEREST Affidavit of Service |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return- served Denise Masi with 1 copy of writ of execution on 1-5-2018 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ Issued and Sent to Sheriff | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt #246033 for $30.00 paid for by WELLS FARGO BANK NA Receipt |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution mortgage foreclosure act 91 & affidavit pursuant to rule 3129.1 Writ of Execution |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt #235512 for $10.00 paid for by FRIDFINNSDOTTIR , ESQ, JANA Receipt |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Relief Suggestion of Bankruptcy |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ Stayed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.