Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
2022-02660
On March 28, 2022 an exhibits case was filed in the jurisdiction of Cumberland County, PA. Judge Christylee L. Peck presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 28, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2023
Filing Location
Cumberland County, PA
Judge
Category
EXHIBITS
Case Outcome Type
FOR APPEAL OF DRIVER'S LICENSE/AUTO REGISTRATION SUSPENSION BY PLFF PRO SE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DATED 11/8/2023 IN RE: APPEAL - BY THE COURT: ALBERT H MASLAND J - | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DATED 11/8/2023 IN RE: CONTINUANCE - BY THE COURT: ALBERT H MASLAND J - | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY WILLIAM D BROWN PRO SE | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DATED 9/12/2023 IN RE: MOTION FOR HEARING - BY THE COURT: JESSICA E BREWBAKER J - RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 09/13/2023 | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | TO SET HEARING DATE BY DEFT | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DATED 1/9/2023 IN RE: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE - BY THE COURT: JESSICA E BREWBAKER J - RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 01/09/2023 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | TO CONTINUE BY PLFF PRO SE | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 11/1/2022 IN RE: LICENSE SUSPENSION - BY THE COURT: MATTHEW P SMITH J - RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 11/01/2022 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FOR CONTINUANCE - BY PLFF PRO SE | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 9/19/2022 BY THE COURT: ALBERT H MASLAND J RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 09/19/2022 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | FOR CONTINUANCE - BY WILLIAM DAVID BROWN PLFF PRO SE | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 6/6/2022 IN RE: LICENSE APPEAL - BY THE COURT: CHRISTYLEE L PECK J - | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 4/19/2022 IN RE: EXPEDITED EMERGENCY SUPERSEDEAS RELIEF - BY THE COURT: CHRISTYLEE L PECK J - RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 04/20/2022 | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | TO PETITION FOR EXPEDITED EMERGENCY SUPERSEDAS RELIEF WITH NEW MATTER - BY MICHAEL J CONNOR ATTY FOR DEFT | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | OF MICHAEL J CONNOR ON BEHALF OF DEFT | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 3/31/2022 IN RE: APPEAL - BY THE COURT: CHRISTYLEE L PECK J - RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 04/04/2022 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 3/31/2022 PETITION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL BY THE COURT Christylee L\. Peck J RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 04/04/2022 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 3/31/2022 BY THE COURT, CHRISTYLEE L, PECK J RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 04/04/2022 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DATED 3/31/2022 BY THE COURT Christylee L\. Peck J RULE 236 NOTICE PROVIDED ON 04/04/2022 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OF THE PETITION FOR EXPEDITED EMERGENCY SUPERSEDEAS RELIEF UPON DEFT ON 3/28/22 BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OF THE APPLICATION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL UPON DEFT ON 3/28/22 BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OF A COPY OF THE APPEAL, ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING AND ALL ATTACHMENTS UPON DEFT ON 3/28/2022 BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR APPEAL OF DRIVERS LICENSE/AUTO REGISTRATION SUSPENSION BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FOR ASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL BY PLFF PRO SE | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FOR APPEAL OF DRIVER'S LICENSE/AUTO REGISTRATION SUSPENSION BY PLFF PRO SE |