Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) case against Mead, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Crawford County, PA, . Crawford County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Rita J. Marwood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCrawford County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by Midland Funding LLC Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
July 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Rita J. Marwood |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Reinstatement Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
January 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Rita J. Marwood |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Rejected Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-3-01 Applies to Megan Mead, Defendant |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.