Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) case against Dobay, Caroline, in the jurisdiction of Crawford County, PA, . Crawford County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Samuel V. Pendolino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Samuel V. Pendolino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCrawford County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Samuel V. Pendolino |
|
February 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Samuel V. Pendolino |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Caroline Dobay Applies to Caroline Dobay, Defendant |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-2-01 Applies to Caroline Dobay, Defendant |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Reinstatement Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-2-01 Applies to Caroline Dobay, Defendant |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-2-01 Applies to Caroline Dobay, Defendant |
|
January 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Samuel V. Pendolino |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Daniel Joseph Santucci, Esq. Applies to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Plaintiff |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 30-2-01 Applies to Caroline Dobay, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.