Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
O W Houts & Son Inc, State College, filed a(n) case against Blaircon Building Co, Altoona, in the jurisdiction of Centre County, PA, . Centre County, PA Superior Courts with Bradley P. Lunsford presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCentre County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by James McKay Rayback, Esq. Applies to O W Houts & Son Inc, Plaintiff |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Petition Filed - Civil Case Filed by Blaircon Building Co Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
August 03, 2005 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Bradley P. Lunsford |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 49-2-01 Applies to Blaircon Building Co, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.