Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Close'S Lumber Co Inc, Roulette, filed a(n) case against Cahilly, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant Close's Lumber Co Inc, Plaintiff |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Requested Filed by Close's Lumber Co Inc Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Bruce Cahilly, Defendant |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Close's Lumber Co Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.