Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gibson Township, Driftwood, filed a(n) case against Hostler, Jeffrey L., in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Jeffrey L. Hostler, Defendant |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Jeffrey L. Hostler, Defendant |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Gibson Township |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Jeffrey L. Hostler, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.