Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mountain Laurel Fcu, Emporium, filed a(n) case against Akins, David, Crumrine, Tristin P, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
March 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
February 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
January 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
December 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.