Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portage Township, Emporium, filed a(n) case against Finch, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Defendant Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant |
|
February 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
February 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Scott Finch Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant Portage Township, Plaintiff |
|
January 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant |
|
November 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Portage Township |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Scott Finch, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.