Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
William G. Satterlee & Sons, Inc., Rochester Mills, filed a(n) case against Grimone, Betty, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by William G. Satterlee & Sons, Inc. Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
September 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by William G. Satterlee & Sons, Inc. |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Betty Grimone, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.