Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bricker, Wayne L., Boyer, Stephen, filed a(n) case against Little, James C., in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to James C. Little, Defendant |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to James C. Little, Defendant |
|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by James C. Little Applies to James C. Little, Defendant |
|
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to James C. Little, Defendant |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Wayne L. Bricker Stephen Boyer Applies to |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Paul J. Malizia, Esq. Applies to Stephen Boyer, Plaintiff |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to James C. Little, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.