Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments, Llc, filed a(n) case against Catalone, Dale J, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, PA, . Cameron County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCameron County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vacated Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Judgment to Common Pleas Filed by ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
|
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barry D. Brown |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC Applies to |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Ian Zev Winograd, Esq. Applies to ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC, Plaintiff |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-01 Applies to Dale J Catalone, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.