Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
B&K Equipment, Llc, filed a(n) case against Unis Demolition Company Ralph E Unis, in the jurisdiction of Beaver County, PA, . Beaver County, PA Superior Courts with Mitchell P. Shahen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBeaver County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-3-04 Applies to Unis Demolition Company/Ralph E Unis, Defendant |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Appeal Filed Filed by Mitchell P. Shahen, Esq. Applies to B&K Equipment, LLC, Plaintiff |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-1-03 Applies to Unis Demolition Company/Ralph E Unis, Defendant |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-1-03 Applies to Unis Demolition Company/Ralph E Unis, Defendant |
|
December 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge James F. DiBenedetto |
|
November 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge James F. DiBenedetto |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by B&K Equipment, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.