Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc C O Hayt Hayt & Landau,Llc, filed a(n) case against Jones, Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Beaver County, PA, . Beaver County, PA Superior Courts with Mitchell P. Shahen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBeaver County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Tim Finn |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Withdrawn Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-2-02 Applies to Sherry Jones, Defendant |
|
October 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Tim Finn |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Mitchell P. Shahen, Esq. Applies to Sherry Jones, Defendant |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Sherry Jones Applies to Sherry Jones, Defendant |
|
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Tim Finn |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-2-02 Applies to Sherry Jones, Defendant |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 36-2-02 Applies to Sherry Jones, Defendant |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC c/o Hayt Hayt & Landau,LLC Applies to |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Robert Louis Baroska III, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding LLC c/o Hayt Hayt & Landau,LLC, Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.