Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Baldwin Borough, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Petition case against Linda Colgan, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Lutty Jr. Paul F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLutty Jr. Paul F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting for Application to Sell and Conservator's Lien Orders of Court | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 06/21/2023 because passed away 02/09/2022. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 06/13/2023. It is ordered that the Court orders a Conservators lien in favor of Community Reinvestment Partners LLC against the property in the amount of $47,887.28. See Order for specifics. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/14/2023. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 06/13/2023. It is ordered that Community Reinvestment Partners LLC is authorized to take title of the subject property for the following reasons: See Order for specifics. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/14/2023. |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 06/07/2023 because return to sender, Deceased. |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 05/31/2023. It is ordered that a hearing on Petitioner's application by the conservator to sell the property out of the conservatorship is scheduled before the undersigned on June 13th, 2023 at 10:45 A.M., Courtroom 814, City-County Building. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/01/2023. |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION BY THE CONSERVATOR TO SELL THE PROPERTY OUT OF THE CONSERVATORSHIP PURSUANT TO 68 P.S. § 1109 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE, ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR, RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 11/22/22. The property meets the conditions for conservatorship under the Abandoned and Blighted Conservatorship Act based on the following Findings of Fact. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 11/23/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.