Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allegheny County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Mccabe, against Carla R. Mcpherson, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settled and Discontinued Costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended and Reissued Writ of Scire Facias | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return McPherson Carla R. was served with Writ- SCI FA on 01/15/2019 by Served - Manager / other person authorized to accept deliveries of United States Mail. MARK MALETZA-TENANT |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien DTD-17-024633 and DTD-18-024472 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.