Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allegheny County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Mccabe, against Eric Ewell, James Nash, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 3/6/20 because return to sender unable to forward judgment return to file not deliverable. |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment In default of an answer in the amount of $1522.13. Certification of mailing of 10 day notice on 02/12/2020 upon defendant's. Notice of judgment sent. Notice sent on 3/6/2020 |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return Nash James was served with Writ- SCI FA on 01/17/2020 by Served - Defendant(s) Personally Served. |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended and Reissued Writ of Scire Facias | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended and Reissued Writ of Scire Facias | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return Eric Ewell was served with Writ- SCI FA on 03/26/2019 by Served - Adult family member with whom said Defendant(s) reside(s). NATE EWELL-SON |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien DTD-17-024535 and DTD-18-024384 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.