Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allegheny County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Mccabe, against Bryant M. Boyd, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2018 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2019 |
Mail Returned on 8/28/19 because return to sender unable to forward court notice return to file insufficient address. |
||
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 8/28/19 because return to sender unable to forward court notice return to file insufficient address. |
|
July 29, 2019 |
Default Judgment In default of an answer in the amount of $4117.42. Certification of mailing of 10 day notice on 06/28/19 upon Bryant M. Boyd. Notice of judgment sent on 7/29/19. |
||
July 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment In default of an answer in the amount of $4117.42. Certification of mailing of 10 day notice on 06/28/19 upon Bryant M. Boyd. Notice of judgment sent on 7/29/19. |
|
May 30, 2019 |
Sheriff Return Bryant Boyd was served with Writ- SCI FA on 05/30/2019 by Served - Defendant(s) Personally Served. |
||
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return Bryant Boyd was served with Writ- SCI FA on 05/30/2019 by Served - Defendant(s) Personally Served. |
|
March 28, 2019 | Praecipe to Reissue Writ of Scire Facias | ||
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Reissue Writ of Scire Facias | |
December 31, 2018 |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien see papers filed |
||
December 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien see papers filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.