Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
, filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Jonathan C Beech, against Lennon Smith Souleret Engineering Inc., Port Vue Plumbing Inc., represented by James M Girman, Mark J Gesk, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settled and Discontinued Costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of interrogatories & requests for production directed to Plaintiff served on all counsel via electronic mail 5/18/17. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to Cross-Claim of Lennon Smith Souleret Engineering Inc. |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to New Matter Plaintiff's reply to defendant LSSE Inc.'s new matter |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply to New Matter | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to New Matter of Port Vue Plumbing Inc. |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer New Matter & Crossclaim | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer and New Matter | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Appearance Filed by James M. Girman, Esq. |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Appearance Filed by Mark J. Gesk, Esq. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.