Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Marcy L., Mark G., Marlene J., filed a(n) Medical/Hospital Liability case represented by Scott M Simon, against , West Haven Manor L.P., represented by Anthony J Williott, Jennifer M. Kirschler, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Hertzberg Alan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHertzberg Alan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryMedical/Hospital Liability |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settled and Discontinued Costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 03/13/19. Petition is granted. Scott M. Simon, Esq. and the law firm of Robert Peirce & Associates PC are hereby instructed to distribute the Settlement Funds of $97,500.00 as follows. Hertzberg J. See Order for specifics. Copies sent. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition For approval of settlement and distribution of wrongful death and survival actions |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents upon Plaintiff?s counsel, Robert F. Daley, Esquire, Scott M. Simon, Esquire by electronic mail on 12/14/18. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to New Matter | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of first set of interrogatories and requests for production documents. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer and New Matter | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Amend Pltfs' Complaint |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated on 12/29/17. Order that the Pltf's. Complaint is Amended as specified. Colville J. See Order as specified. |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue Argument of Preliminary Objections. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.