Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carnegie Borough, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Mccabe, against John E., Unknown Heirs Of Jolly E. Huggins Deceased, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settled and Discontinued Costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return John Huggins was served with Writ- SCI FA on 01/04/2018 by Served - Defendant(s) Personally Served. |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended and Reissued Writ of Scire Facias | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended and Reissued Writ of Scire Facias | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return John E. Huggins was served with Writ- SCI FA on 1/12/2017 by Served - Other - see comments. VACANT - POSTED |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien see papers filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.