Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elizabeth Forward School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jennifer L. Cerce, against Lisa D. Madden, Shawn K. Madden, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Walko Jr. Donald R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalko Jr. Donald R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return Writ of Execution - Costs paid. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction This Judgement is satisfied in full and costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Of stay |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR SPECIAL ORDER OF COURT FOR POSTPONEMENT OF SHERIFF'S SALE PURSUANT TO Pa. R.C.P. 312.3 |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 11/06/19. Order that postponement of the Sheriff's Sale of the Subject Property from September 3, 2019 to the scheduled June 1, 2020 Sheriff's Sale is hereby ratified without new Notice or further Advertisement. Walko J. Notice sent. |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion For special order of court for postponement of sheriffs sale pursuant to PA. R.C.P. 3129.3 |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 03/26/19. The postponement of the Sheriff's Sale of the Subject Property from March 4, 2019 until the regularly scheduled September 3, 2019 Sheriff's Sale is hereby ratified without new Notice or further Advertisement. McVay J. See Order for specifics. Copies sent. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion For special order of court for postponement of sheriffs sale pursuant to PA. R.C.P. 3129.3 |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 10/26/18. The postponement of the Sheriff's Sale of the Subject Property from September 4, 2018 to the scheduled March 4, 2019 Sheriff's Sale is hereby ratified without new Notice or Advertising. Hertzberg J. See Order for specifics. Copies sent. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Writ of Execution-Real Property $15,233.92 plus attorney costs $329.50. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.