Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Victoria Robertson, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against George Powell, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Bicket Alexander P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2016 |
CategoryProtection From Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2016 |
PFA Withdrawal Dated 07/27/2016. At plaintiff's request, PFA Petition is WITHDRAWN. The temporary PFA order is vacated and all costs are waived. Clark, J. |
||
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
PFA Withdrawal Dated 07/27/2016. At plaintiff's request, PFA Petition is WITHDRAWN. The temporary PFA order is vacated and all costs are waived. Clark, J. |
|
May 27, 2016 |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 05/24/2016. Case continued to 07/27/2016 at 09:00 A.M. before Clark, J. |
||
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 05/24/2016. Case continued to 07/27/2016 at 09:00 A.M. before Clark, J. |
|
May 06, 2016 |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA Petition and order upon George by personal service on 04/25/16. |
||
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA Petition and order upon George by personal service on 04/25/16. |
|
May 05, 2016 |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 05/03/16. Case continued to 05/24/16 at 9:00 before Clark,J. |
||
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 05/03/16. Case continued to 05/24/16 at 9:00 before Clark,J. |
|
April 27, 2016 |
Temporary PFA Order with Custody Dated 04/25/2016. Temporary order of court. George is excluded from Victoria's residence until final hearing which will be held on 05/03/16 at 9:00 am before Bigley, J. Bicket, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
||
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary PFA Order with Custody Dated 04/25/2016. Temporary order of court. George is excluded from Victoria's residence until final hearing which will be held on 05/03/16 at 9:00 am before Bigley, J. Bicket, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.