Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Christopher Justice, Leann Fravens, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Christopher Justice, Leann Fravens, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Bicket Alexander P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2016 |
CategoryProtection From Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA Petition and order upon LeAnn by personal service on 03/16/16. |
||
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA Petition and order upon LeAnn by personal service on 03/16/16. |
|
March 18, 2016 |
Temporary PFA Order with Custody Dated 03/16/2016. Temporary order of court. Christopher is excluded from LeAnn's residence until final hearing which will be held on 03/29/2016 at 9:00 am before Mulligan, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
||
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary PFA Order with Custody Dated 03/16/2016. Temporary order of court. Christopher is excluded from LeAnn's residence until final hearing which will be held on 03/29/2016 at 9:00 am before Mulligan, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.