Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kylie Mckenna, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nathaniel Finch, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Bicket Alexander P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBicket Alexander P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2015 |
CategoryProtection From Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA petition and order upon Nathaniel by personal service on 08/20/15. |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final PFA Order of Court Dated 09/03/2015. Final order of court. Nathaniel is excluded from Kylie's residence. Costs of filing fees and certification are placed upon Nathaniel. This order expires on 05/31/2016. $100 fee waived as per order filed. Clark, J. |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition for PFA Dated 08/20/2015. Temporary order of court. Nathaniel is excluded from Kylie's residence until final hearing which will be held on 09/03/15 at 9:00 am before Bicket, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.