Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wholesale Properties Llc, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Chris Ross, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Lutty Jr. Paul F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLutty Jr. Paul F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settled and Discontinued Cost paid Sheriff at Execution. |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Lis Pendens 2113 Straubs Lane, Pittsburgh, PA 15212, Twenty-Fourth Ward, City of Pittsburgh, Lot and Block No.: 49-A-287 |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Alternative Service | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 05/31/22. The petitioner shall be permitted to serve respondent by posting, first class mail with a certificate of mailing and by publication in the Pittsburgh Post Gazette. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/03/2022. |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correction Docket filing date was inadvertently docketed as 01/03/2022 instead of 12/31/2021. Correction was made on 02/03/2022. |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Appearance | |
December 31, 2021 | Petition for Conservatorship | ||
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Conservatorship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.