Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wholesale Properties Llc, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Pittsburgh Affordable Homes Llc, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Lutty Jr. Paul F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLutty Jr. Paul F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 06/08/23. This court finds that conservator is authorized to sell the property for the following reasons. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/09/2023. |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 06/08/23. The court has heard relevant testimony and received documenting the work and costs incurred by the conservator for the purpose of stabilizing, rehabilitating and maintaining the property as required by the Abandoned and Blighted Property Conservatorship Act. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/09/2023. |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 05/31/2023. It is ordered that a hearing on the application by the conservator to sell the property out of the conservatorship is scheduled before the undersigned on June 8th, 2023 at 10:00 A.M., Courtroom 814, City-County Building. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/01/2023. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION BY THE CONSERVATOR TO SELL THE PROPERTY OUT OF THE CONSERVATORSHIP PURSUANT TO 68 P.S. § 1109 | |
February 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Appearance | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 01/31/23. The court has beard relevant testimony and received receipts documenting the work and cost by the conservator for the purpose of rehabilitating and maintaining the property as required by the Abandoned and Blighted Property Conservatorship Act. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 02/02/2023. |
|
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike senior non-government lien pursuant to 68 P.S. 1109(C) |
|
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 01/30/23. a hearing on Petitioner?s Application by the Conservator to Sell the Property Out of the Conservatorship is scheduled before the undersigned on January 31, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 814, City-County Building. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 01/31/2023. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION BY THE CONSERVATOR TO SELL THE PROPERTY OUT OF THE CONSERVATORSHIP PURSUANT TO 68 P.S. ? 1109 | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 07/21/22 Ordered 1. The Property meets the conditions for conservatorship under 1105(c) of the Abandoned and Blighted Conservatorship Act, 68 P. S. 1101-111 based on the following Findings of Fact: See order for Specifics. Lutty, J. As oer Rule Notice, copies sent to all parties 07/22/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.