Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rising Tide Partners, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Derek Green, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Lutty Jr. Paul F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLutty Jr. Paul F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING OF ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Court Dated 06/09/2022. The hearing scheduled for 06/09/2022 shall be continued. (Lutty, J.) See Order. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 06/10/2022. | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Appearance | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer To petition for appointment of a conservator |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court DATED 05/2/22 ordered that upon consideration of the Petition for Appointment of a conservator it is ordered as follows. See order as specified. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 05/03/2022 |
|
May 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 05/02/22 Upon consideration of the Petition for the Appointment of a Conservator pursuant to the Abandoned and Blighted Property Conservatorship Act. 68 P.S. 1101 et seq.). it appearing that a prima facie showing of entitlement to the relief requested concerning the property described in the Petition has made, it is Ordered that. See order for specifics. Lutty, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 05/02/22 |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Appearance Also filed by City of Pittburgh |
|
January 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Obtain Hearing Date | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.