Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wholesale Properties Llc, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Jerry Roman Misiaszak, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Lutty Jr. Paul F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLutty Jr. Paul F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 11/04/2022 because return to sender. Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned on 10/20/22 because RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 10/13/22. The petitioner shall be permitted to serve respondent by posting, first class mail with a certificate of mail and publication. Lutty J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 10/14/2022. |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Appearance Also filed by Pittsburgh Water and Sewer interested party |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Alternative Service Pursuant to Pa.R.C.P. 430. |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Certification of Mailing | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING FOR NOTICE OF FILING | |
July 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF A PETITION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A CONSERVATOR | |
July 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Lis Pendens | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Conservatorship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.