Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alexander P Bicket filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Bicket Alexander P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryAdministrative Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court DATED 01/10/2022 in consideration of the President Judge's order regarding the suspension of jury trials dated January 6 2022 and the recent dramatic increase in the number of COVID 19 cases in Allegheny County, it is hereby ordered that the above captioned Grand Jury shall not meet on the sessions scheduled through January 31 2022. Grand Jury sessions will resume as scheduled in February 2022 Bicket, J. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 04/05/21. Ordered that the Application of Stephen A. Zappala, Jr., District Attorney of Allegheny County, Pennsylvania, and Attorney for the Commonwealth, requesting an Order Directing that an Additional County Investigating Grand Jury be Summoned is hereby granted. See Order for Specifics. Clark, P.J. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 10/19/20 Ordered that the Application of Stephen A. Zappala, Jr., District Attorney of Allegheny County, Pennsylvania, and Attorney for the Commonwealth, requesting an Order Directing that an Additional County Investigating Grand Jury be Summoned is hereby granted. See Order for Specifics. Clark, P.J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.