Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Elizabeth Forward School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Lawrence J. Maiello, against David J., in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with Hertzberg Alan D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 10/27/23 Ordered the postponement of the Sheriffs Sale is now scheduled for February 6, 2024. See Order for specifics. Szefi, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 10/27/23 |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 07/11/23. The postponement of the sheriffs sale to September 5 2023 is hereby ratified. McVay J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 07/12/2023. |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 03/31/23. The postponement of the sheriffs sale to June 5 2023 is hereby ratified. McGinley J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 04/03/2023. |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 03/02/2023. Final Order of Court in this matter by Judge McGinley. See Order for specifics. McGinley, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 03/03/2023. |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Of the rule to show cause order of court rule date by the sheriff of Allegheny County , Pennsylvania on Feb 2,2023 and by first class mail on Feb 2,2023 |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF THE DATE OF CONTINUTED SHERIFF SALE |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Dated 01/19/23. A rule is hereby issued upon defendant and respondent directing them to show cause why the property should not be sold at sheriffs sale. Answers to the petition if any shall be filed by defendant and respondents within 20 days. Argument shall be held on March 2nd 2023 at 9:45 a.m. before the Motions Judge. Hertzberg J see order for specifics As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 01/20/2023. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.