Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Miranda, Wilburg, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J. Hara Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.