Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Neves, Eric Steven, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJune 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.