Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Munsinger, Zachary A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jack M. Jacobson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack M. Jacobson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions580 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time580 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Emergency Orders- Denied | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.