Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Encompass Management & Consulting, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Beaty, Bj, Tantay, Alexandria A., in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Motion stay of execution Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Allow stay of execution Judge: Queen, Amy M |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion - Stay Execution | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Application - Fee Deferral Waiver | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Fee Waiver Forms $0.75 Judge: Authority, Administrative |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute NORI POSTED 03/07/23 and Cert of Mail 03/07/23 |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Limited Judgment as to BJ Beaty ONLY Judge: Queen, Amy M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.