Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Oakbrook Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Barrera, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Matthew Tracey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Tracey, Matthew |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute NORI POSTED 02/09/23 |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Trial
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute POSTING |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.