Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hews, Richard D, Hews, Sharon F, Shelter Management, Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Lyles, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document dismissal Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return - Mail Hearing Notice: 01/31/23 UNCLAIMED |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Continue
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute Posting |
|
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration Non-Military | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.