Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jason Lee Manor, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Murphy, Timothy L, Tinsley, Peter H, against All Others, Mcclure, Ima M., in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service NORI |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Queen, Amy M |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration - Non-Compliance | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Queen, Amy M |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Stipulated
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.